House | 04/05/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | No New File by Committee on Banking | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Banking | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | File Number 151 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | House Calendar Number 133 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |