House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-129
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
File Number 725
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 500
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4534
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2016
|
File Number 152
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2016
|
House Calendar Number 134
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|