Senate | 04/27/2016 | File Number 743 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 525 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4928 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | File Number 487 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | House Calendar Number 308 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |