House | 03/23/2016 | File Number 153 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | House Calendar Number 135 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |