House | 04/06/2016 | Motion Failed JF | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | File Number 74 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | House Calendar Number 91 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |