House
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Special Act 16-9
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
File Number 701
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 442
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3975
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
File Number 356
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
House Calendar Number 250
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|