House | 06/09/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Special Act 16-10 | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 378 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | File Number 528 | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | House Calendar Number 330 | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |