House | 03/30/2016 | File Number 285 | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | House Calendar Number 210 | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/29/2016 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |