House
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Public Act 16-57
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
File Number 744
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 524
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4755
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 286
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 211
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|