Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05491 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5491
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 2342
3- *_____HB05491FIN___032916____*
3+ *02342_______FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 5491
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 2342
1515
16-*_____HB05491FIN___032916____*
16+*02342_______FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING THE FILM TAX CREDIT.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subdivision (3) of subsection (a) of section 12-217jj of the 2016 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
2929
3030 (3) (A) "Qualified production" means entertainment content created in whole or in part within the state, including motion pictures, except as otherwise provided in this subparagraph; documentaries; long-form, specials, mini-series, series, sound recordings, videos and music videos and interstitials television programming; interactive television; relocated television production; interactive games; videogames; commercials; any format of digital media, including an interactive web site, created for distribution or exhibition to the general public; and any trailer, pilot, video teaser or demo created primarily to stimulate the sale, marketing, promotion or exploitation of future investment in either a product or a qualified production via any means and media in any digital media format, film or videotape, provided such program meets all the underlying criteria of a qualified production. For the state fiscal years ending June 30, 2014, June 30, 2015, June 30, 2016, and June 30, 2017, "qualified production" shall not include a motion picture that has not been designated as a state-certified qualified production prior to July 1, 2013, and no tax credit voucher for such motion picture may be issued during said years, except, for the state fiscal years ending June 30, 2015, June 30, 2016, and June 30, 2017, "qualified production" shall include (i) a motion picture for which twenty-five per cent or more of the principal photography shooting days are in this state at a facility that receives not less than twenty-five million dollars in private investment and opens for business on or after July 1, 2013, and a tax credit voucher may be issued for such motion picture, or (ii) a production for which at least half of the entertainment content is produced in this state, at least half of the personnel reside in this state and the total cost of production is less than two million dollars, and a tax credit voucher may be issued for such production.
3131
3232 (B) "Qualified production" shall not include any ongoing television program created primarily as news, weather or financial market reports; a production featuring current events, other than a relocated television production, sporting events, an awards show or other gala event; a production whose sole purpose is fundraising; a long-form production that primarily markets a product or service; a production used for corporate training or in-house corporate advertising or other similar productions; or any production for which records are required to be maintained under 18 USC 2257 with respect to sexually explicit content.
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3838 Section 1 from passage 12-217jj(a)(3)
3939
4040 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4141
4242 Section 1
4343
4444 from passage
4545
4646 12-217jj(a)(3)
4747
48+Statement of Purpose:
4849
50+To expand the qualified productions eligible for the film tax credit for the 2015, 2016 and 2017 fiscal years.
4951
50-FIN Joint Favorable
51-
52-FIN
53-
54-Joint Favorable
52+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]