House | 04/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 582 | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | File Number 593 | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | House Calendar Number 364 | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |