Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05493 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5493
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 2336
33 *02336_______FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 5493
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 2336
1515
1616 *02336_______FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT PHASING OUT THE AMBULATORY SURGICAL CENTER TAX.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 12-263i of the 2016 supplement of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2016, and applicable to calendar quarters commencing on or after said date):
2929
3030 (a) As used in this section:
3131
3232 (1) "Ambulatory surgical center" means an entity included within the definition of said term that is set forth in 42 CFR 416.2 and that is licensed by the Department of Public Health as an outpatient surgical facility, and any other ambulatory surgical center that is Medicare certified;
3333
3434 (2) "Commissioner" means the Commissioner of Revenue Services; and
3535
3636 (3) "Department" means the Department of Revenue Services.
3737
3838 (b) (1) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after October 1, 2015, and prior to October 1, 2016, there is hereby imposed a tax on each ambulatory surgical center in this state to be paid each calendar quarter. The tax imposed by this section shall be at the rate of six per cent of the gross receipts of each ambulatory surgical center, except that such tax shall not be imposed on any amount of such gross receipts that constitutes either (A) the first million dollars of gross receipts of the ambulatory surgical center in the applicable fiscal year, or (B) net patient revenue of a hospital that is subject to the tax imposed under this chapter.
3939
4040 (2) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after October 1, 2016, and prior to October 1, 2017, there is hereby imposed a tax on each ambulatory surgical center in this state to be paid each calendar quarter. The tax imposed by this section shall be at the rate of four per cent of the gross receipts of each ambulatory surgical center, except that such tax shall not be imposed on any amount of such gross receipts that constitutes either (A) the first million dollars of gross receipts of the ambulatory surgical center in the applicable fiscal year, or (B) net patient revenue of a hospital that is subject to the tax imposed under this chapter.
4141
4242 (3) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after October 1, 2017, and prior to October 1, 2018, there is hereby imposed a tax on each ambulatory surgical center in this state to be paid each calendar quarter. The tax imposed by this section shall be at the rate of two per cent of the gross receipts of each ambulatory surgical center, except that such tax shall not be imposed on any amount of such gross receipts that constitutes either (A) the first million dollars of gross receipts of the ambulatory surgical center in the applicable fiscal year, or (B) net patient revenue of a hospital that is subject to the tax imposed under this chapter.
4343
4444 (4) With respect to calendar quarters commencing on or after October 1, 2018, no tax shall be imposed by this section.
4545
4646 (5) Nothing in this section shall prohibit an ambulatory surgical center from seeking remuneration for the tax imposed by this section.
4747
4848 [(2)] (6) Each ambulatory surgical center shall, on or before January 31, 2016, and thereafter on or before the last day of January, April, July and October of each year, until November 1, 2018, render to the commissioner a return, on forms prescribed or furnished by the commissioner, reporting the name and location of such ambulatory surgical center, the entire amount of gross receipts generated by such ambulatory surgical center during the calendar quarter ending on the last day of the preceding month and such other information as the commissioner deems necessary for the proper administration of this section. The tax imposed under this section shall be due and payable on the due date of such return. Each ambulatory surgical center shall be required to file such return electronically with the department and to make payment of such tax by electronic funds transfer in the manner provided by chapter 228g, regardless of whether such ambulatory surgical center would have otherwise been required to file such return electronically or to make such tax payment by electronic funds transfer under the provisions of chapter 228g.
4949
5050 (c) Whenever the tax imposed under this section is not paid when due, a penalty of ten per cent of the amount due and unpaid or fifty dollars, whichever is greater, shall be imposed and interest at the rate of one per cent per month or fraction thereof shall accrue on such tax from the due date of such tax until the date of payment.
5151
5252 (d) The provisions of sections 12-548, 12-550 to 12-554, inclusive, and 12-555a shall apply to the provisions of this section in the same manner and with the same force and effect as if the language of said sections had been incorporated in full into this section and had expressly referred to the tax imposed under this section, except to the extent that any provision is inconsistent with a provision in this section.
5353
5454 (e) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2016, and each fiscal year thereafter, the Comptroller is authorized to record as revenue for each fiscal year the amount of tax imposed under the provisions of this section prior to the end of each fiscal year and which tax is received by the Commissioner of Revenue Services not later than five business days after the last day of July immediately following the end of each fiscal year.
5555
5656
5757
5858
5959 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6060 Section 1 October 1, 2016, and applicable to calendar quarters commencing on or after said date the 2016 supplement12-263i
6161
6262 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6363
6464 Section 1
6565
6666 October 1, 2016, and applicable to calendar quarters commencing on or after said date
6767
6868 the 2016 supplement12-263i
6969
7070 Statement of Purpose:
7171
7272 To phase out the ambulatory surgical center tax over a three-year period.
7373
7474 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]