House | 04/11/2016 | File Number 566 | ||
House | 04/11/2016 | House Calendar Number 349 | ||
House | 04/11/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |