House
|
05/27/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Public Act 16-62
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
File Number 728
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 498
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4080
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
File Number 494
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
House Calendar Number 315
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|