House | 04/19/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/11/2016 | File Number 569 | ||
House | 04/11/2016 | House Calendar Number 352 | ||
House | 04/11/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |