House | 05/04/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 603 | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | File Number 608 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | House Calendar Number 376 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |