Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05573 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5573
2-February Session, 2016 *_____HB05573CE____031816____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5573
2+February Session, 2016 LCO No. 2666
3+ *02666_______CE_*
4+Referred to Committee on COMMERCE
5+Introduced by:
6+(CE)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 5573
10+Raised Bill No. 5573
711
812 February Session, 2016
913
10-*_____HB05573CE____031816____*
14+LCO No. 2666
15+
16+*02666_______CE_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on COMMERCE
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(CE)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING AN EXTENSION OF THE FIRST FIVE PLUS PROGRAM.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. Section 32-4l of the 2016 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2016):
1729
1830 (a) (1) The Department of Economic and Community Development shall establish a first five plus program to encourage business expansion and job creation. As part of said program, the department may provide substantial financial assistance to up to [fifteen] twenty eligible business development projects by June 30, [2016] 2019.
1931
2032 (2) A business development project eligible for financial assistance under the first five plus program shall commit, in the manner prescribed by the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, to (A) create not less than two hundred new jobs within twenty-four months from the date such application is approved; or (B) invest not less than twenty-five million dollars and create not less than two hundred new jobs not later than five years after the date such application is approved.
2133
2234 (3) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development may give preference to a business development project that (A) involves the relocation of an out-of-state or international manufacturer or corporate headquarters, (B) involves the relocation of jobs that are outside the United States to the state, [or] (C) is a redevelopment project [if] that the commissioner believes [such redevelopment project] will create jobs sooner than the schedule set forth in subdivision (2) of this subsection, (D) is located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p, or (E) involves a targeted industry referenced in the economic development strategic plan for the state prepared pursuant to section 32-1o.
2335
2436 (4) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development may, in awarding financial assistance to an eligible business development project, work with Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated, to secure financing for such project.
2537
2638 (5) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development shall certify to the Governor for his or her approval that a business development project applicant has satisfied all the eligibility criteria in the program. Financial assistance awarded through the first five plus program shall be with the written consent of the Governor.
2739
2840 (b) Financial assistance for the first five plus program for eligible business development projects shall be exempt from the provisions of subsection (c) of section 32-223, section 32-462, subsection (q) of section 32-9t and, at the commissioner's discretion, section 12-211a for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2012, June 30, 2013, June 30, 2014, June 30, 2015, June 30, 2016, [and] June 30, 2017, June 30, 2018, June 30, 2019, and June 30, 2020.
2941
3042 (c) The commissioner may take such action as the commissioner deems necessary or appropriate to enforce such commitment, including, but not limited to, establishing terms and conditions for the repayment of any financial assistance awarded pursuant to the provisions of this section.
3143
3244 (d) On or before September 1, 2013, January 1, 2014, September 1, 2014, January 1, 2015, September 1, 2015, January 1, 2016, [and] September 1, 2016, January 1, 2017, September 1, 2017, January 1, 2018, September 1, 2018, January 1, 2019, and September 1, 2019, the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development shall report in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and finance, revenue and bonding on the projects funded through the first five plus program, the number of jobs created and the impact on the economy of this state.
3345
34-(e) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section, on or after July 1, 2016, the department shall not provide financial assistance to any additional business development project under this section until: (1) The commissioner submits a report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and finance that includes (A) the net rate of return to the state for the entire portfolio of the first five plus program, taking into account all loans that have been forgiven and all tax credits that have been allowed in accordance with this section, and (B) based on such net rate of return, a recommendation as to whether the first five plus program should continue; and (2) said joint standing committees vote, in concurrence, to approve such recommendation.
35-
3646
3747
3848
3949 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4050 Section 1 July 1, 2016 32-4l
4151
4252 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4353
4454 Section 1
4555
4656 July 1, 2016
4757
4858 32-4l
4959
60+Statement of Purpose:
5061
62+To extend the first five plus program and give a preference under such program to business development projects located in a distressed municipality or involving a targeted industry.
5163
52-CE Joint Favorable Subst.
53-
54-CE
55-
56-Joint Favorable Subst.
64+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]