House | 03/22/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |