House | 04/04/2016 | File Number 418 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | House Calendar Number 283 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |