House | 04/25/2016 | File Number 730 | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4347 | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | No New File by Committee on General Law | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on General Law | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | File Number 420 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | House Calendar Number 285 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |