House | 03/31/2016 | File Number 362 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | House Calendar Number 256 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |