Senate | 06/09/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Public Act 16-141 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 514 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | File Number 363 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | House Calendar Number 257 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |