Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
File Number 755
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 535
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5062
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
File Number 421
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
House Calendar Number 286
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|