House | 04/14/2016 | File Number 611 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | House Calendar Number 391 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |