House | 04/22/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 479 | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | File Number 422 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | House Calendar Number 287 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |