House | 04/05/2016 | File Number 466 | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | House Calendar Number 303 | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |