Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05604 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5604
2-February Session, 2016 *_____HB05604PD____032116____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5604
2+February Session, 2016 LCO No. 2690
3+ *02690_______PD_*
4+Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
5+Introduced by:
6+(PD)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 5604
10+Raised Bill No. 5604
711
812 February Session, 2016
913
10-*_____HB05604PD____032116____*
14+LCO No. 2690
15+
16+*02690_______PD_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(PD)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING REGIONAL EFFICIENCIES.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) The Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies shall, in consultation with the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management or the secretary's designee, municipalities, labor unions and business leaders, study regionalization best practices in other states and develop a regionalization evaluation tool based on such best practices. Such regionalization evaluation tool shall measure and assess the performance of and efficiencies achieved by each municipality and local and regional board of education.
1729
18-Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) Not later than July 1, 2017, the Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies shall submit recommendations for state funding to municipalities based on criteria established by the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to local governments and appropriations.
30+Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) Not later than January 1, 2017, the Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies shall submit recommendations for municipal aid funding based on criteria established by the regionalization evaluation tool referenced in section 1 of this act, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to local governments and appropriations.
1931
20-Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) If legislation is enacted based on the criteria established by the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall notify municipalities and local or regional boards of education of such criteria and specify how state funding to municipalities will be determined based on performance relative to such criteria for fiscal year 2019. The Office of Policy and Management shall prescribe a format by which each municipality and local or regional board of education shall report its compliance with the criteria established by said tool. Not later than February 1, 2018, each municipality and local or regional board of education shall submit such report to the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management. The Office of Policy and Management may audit municipalities and local or regional boards of education to ensure compliance.
32+Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) If legislation is enacted based on the criteria of the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall notify municipalities and local or regional boards of education of such criteria and specify how municipal aid funding will be determined based on such criteria for fiscal year 2019. The Office of Policy and Management shall prescribe a format by which each municipality and local or regional board of education shall report its compliance with the criteria established by such tool. Not later than February 1, 2018, each municipality and local or regional board of education shall submit such report to the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management. The Office of Policy and Management may audit municipalities and local or regional boards of education to ensure compliance.
2133
22-Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2018) The Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall implement the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act and adjust state funding to municipalities and local or regional boards of education based on each municipality and local or regional board of education's performance relative to the criteria established by said tool. For the purposes of this section, the state funding adjustments based on performance relative to the criteria of the regionalization evaluation tool shall not apply to discretionary state funding to municipalities.
34+Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2018) The Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall implement the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act and apply the municipal aid funding formula based on each municipality and local or regional board of education's performance relative to the criteria of such tool.
2335
2436
2537
2638
2739 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2840 Section 1 July 1, 2016 New section
2941 Sec. 2 July 1, 2016 New section
3042 Sec. 3 July 1, 2017 New section
3143 Sec. 4 July 1, 2018 New section
3244
3345 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3446
3547 Section 1
3648
3749 July 1, 2016
3850
3951 New section
4052
4153 Sec. 2
4254
4355 July 1, 2016
4456
4557 New section
4658
4759 Sec. 3
4860
4961 July 1, 2017
5062
5163 New section
5264
5365 Sec. 4
5466
5567 July 1, 2018
5668
5769 New section
5870
59-Statement of Legislative Commissioners:
71+Statement of Purpose:
6072
61-In Section 2, "as described in" was changed to "developed pursuant to" for accuracy and consistency; in Section 3, "of" was changed to "established by" for clarity and consistency and "performance relative to" was added before "such criteria for fiscal year 2019." for accuracy and consistency; in Section 4, "of" was changed to "established by" for clarity and consistency; in Section 5, "performance relative to" was added before "the criteria of" for accuracy and consistency; and Section 5 was combined with Section 4 for conciseness.
73+To (1) authorize the Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies to develop a regionalization evaluation tool to measure and assess the performance of and efficiencies achieved by each municipality and local and regional board of education and submit recommendations for municipal aid funding based on the criteria of such tool, (2) require the Office of Policy and Management to notify municipalities and local and regional boards of education of such criteria if the General Assembly implements such criteria through legislation, and (3) require the Office of Policy and Management to implement the regionalization evaluation tool.
6274
63-
64-
65-PD Joint Favorable Subst.
66-
67-PD
68-
69-Joint Favorable Subst.
75+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]