House | 04/12/2016 | File Number 586 | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | House Calendar Number 360 | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Public Hearing 03/21 | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |