House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Public Act 16-181
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 595
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6187
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
File Number 500
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
House Calendar Number 321
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|