House
|
06/03/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Special Act 16-4
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 569
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5743
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
File Number 669
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Calendar Number 424
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|