House | 04/07/2016 | File Number 544 | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | House Calendar Number 346 | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Public Hearing 03/21 | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |