House
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-148
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
File Number 732
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 489
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4592
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
File Number 614
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
House Calendar Number 380
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/23
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|