House | 04/21/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | File Number 615 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | House Calendar Number 381 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Public Hearing 03/23 | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |