House | 03/03/2016 | File Number 1 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | House Calendar Number 37 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/23/2016 | House Favorable | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Filed with House Clerks 02/08 |