House | 04/22/2016 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | File Number 504 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | House Calendar Number 325 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | House Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |