Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | File Number 32 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 81 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |