Senate | 06/06/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Public Act 16-155 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 494 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | File Number 80 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 116 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |