Senate | 03/03/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/01/2016 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |