Senate | 04/19/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | File Number 24 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 76 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/02/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/01/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |