Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | File Number 5 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 60 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |