Senate
|
06/07/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Special Act 16-16
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Calendar Number 576
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5509
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
File Number 200
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 178
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|