Senate | 05/06/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Public Act 16-11 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 452 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | File Number 26 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 70 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |