Senate | 06/06/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Public Act 16-156 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2016 | House Calendar Number 542 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | File Number 14 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 65 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |