Senate | 04/29/2016 | House Recommitted to Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | House Calendar Number 428 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3896 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | File Number 467 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 321 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |