Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Special Act 16-5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5669
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
House Calendar Number 395
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 304
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 246
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|