Senate | 03/04/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/29/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |