Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | File Number 575 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 362 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |