Senate | 04/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 496 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4744 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | File Number 45 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 88 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |