Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Public Act 16-27
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 515
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5299
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
File Number 365
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 257
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|