Senate | 04/12/2016 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | File Number 258 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 198 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |